04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
27.06.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
19.07.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
17.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.03.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
15.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
08.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
05.10.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.02.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
03.02.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
03.02.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.12.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
06.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
16.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
30.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|