Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009052661 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN03058 | 26.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8212499 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2012 | B2 | US2010244751 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN03058 | 26.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2218182 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B1 | EP2218182 | 07.03.2012 | A4 | EP2218182 | 18.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN03058 | 26.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101836361 | 15.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN03058 | 26.10.2007 |