EP2218182 - MENU CONTROL FOR 1D GESTURE LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LITE-ON IT Corporation 14F., No. 392 Rueiguang Road Neihu Taipei City T'ai pei 114 / TW | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ENDERT, Tony, Petrus 14F, No.392 Ruey Kuang Rd. Neihu Taipei Taiwan / CN | [2013/34] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
VAN ENDERT, Tony, Petrus 14F, No.392 Ruey Kuang Rd. Neihu Taipei Taiwan / CN | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei Rosenheimer Strasse 139 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Lang, Christian, et al IP Law Firm LangRaible Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 22 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07816671.7 | 26.10.2007 | [2010/33] | WO2007CN03058 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009052661 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218182 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218182 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H03K17/94 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H03K17/94 (EP,US);
H05B47/125 (EP,US);
H03K2217/94005 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/11] | H03K17/94 | ||
Former IPC [2012/10] | H03K17/00, H05B37/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/33] | H03K17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | MENÜSTEUERUNG FÜR EIN 1D-GESTIK-LICHTSTEUERSYSTEM | [2010/33] | English: | MENU CONTROL FOR 1D GESTURE LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM | [2010/33] | French: | COMMANDE DE MENU POUR SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE GESTUELLE DE L'ÉCLAIRAGE EN UNE DIMENSION | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 10.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2007 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | IE | 26.10.2013 | LU | 26.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.10.2007 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
LU | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006056814 (MATHMOS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 23 * * page 12, line 4 - page 14, line 32 * * page 7, line 17 - line 30 *; | [A]DE19921285 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 37 - line 64; figure 4 * * "ultraschall-detektionssignale"; column 3, line 39 - line 45 *; | [A]US2006044800 (REIME GERD [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 55 - paragraph 57; figures 9-11 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0071]; figure 12 *; | [A]US4305006 (WALTHALL MICHAEL S, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2006056814 (MATHMOS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]GB2291289 (MURRELLS ROBERT IAN [GB], et al) |