EP2099155 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING CLIENT REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Zhaoqi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07817141.0 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007CN70950 | Priority number, date | CN200610168385 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610168385 | [2009/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077325 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2099155 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/16, H04L29/08, G06Q10/06, H04L12/66 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
H04L67/567 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | H04L12/16, H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2009/37] | H04L12/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERARBEITEN EINER CLIENT-ANFORDERUNG | [2009/37] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING CLIENT REQUEST | [2009/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE DEMANDE CLIENT | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2009 | Translation filed | 30.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 29.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002156641 (KITAJIMA HIRONOBU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] *; | [IA]WO2004030325 (SYSLORE OY [FI], et al) [I] 1 * page 1, line 12 - line 27 * * page 3, line 19 - line 32 * [A] 2-15; | [IA]US2005022157 (BRENDLE RAINER [DE], et al) [I] 1 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0093] * [A] 2-15; | [IA]US2005038911 (WATANABE YOSHIKUNI [JP], et al) [I] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 1,2,6,9,14,16 * [A] 11 | International search | [A]CN1501643 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]EP1478158 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]); | [X]CN1767446 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]CN1996863 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | US2005038911 |