EP2075981 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AVOIDING LABEL COLLISION WHEN PBT IS CONTROLLED BY GMPLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Hongguang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07817345.7 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007CN71155 | Priority number, date | CN200610157775 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610157775 | [2009/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077340 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2075981 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/507 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON LABELKOLLISION, WENN PBT DURCH GMPLS KONTROLLIERT WIRD | [2009/27] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AVOIDING LABEL COLLISION WHEN PBT IS CONTROLLED BY GMPLS | [2009/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ÉVITER UN CONFLIT D'ÉTIQUETTES LORSQUE PBT EST CONTRÔLÉ PAR GMPLS | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2009 | Translation filed | 28.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 08.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002172155 (KASVAND-HARRIS ANGELICA GRACE [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 3, paragraph 57 - page 4, paragraph 63 * * pages 1-6 *; | [X]US2005198375 (HWANG CHUL-HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 3, paragraph 40 - page 5, paragraph 81 * * page 6, paragraph 86 - page 7, paragraph 109 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2005259674 (CUERVO J F [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, paragraph 19 - page 3, paragraph 33 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2006221816 (NAGATA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 12 * * page 4, paragraph 71 - page 5, paragraph 92 * * page 7, paragraph 111 - paragraph 116 * * figures 1,9,32-34 *; | [A] - ZHENG HUANG YANG YANG HUAWEI, "The Solution of Label Collision Between Multicast and Unicast; draft-huang-lable-collision-00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20060616), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015046128 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2001033574 (ENOKI TOHRU [JP], et al); | [A]US2003149895 (CHOO TSE HUONG [GB], et al); | [A]CN1761228 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |