EP2069803 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL FLOW MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERLACH, Christof Hans-Sachs-Strasse 4c 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
ZIELINSKI, Michael Peter-Schuster-Weg 25 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [2009/25] | Application number, filing date | 07817492.7 | 07.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007DE01619 | Priority number, date | DE20061043445 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006043445 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008031412 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2069803 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/00, G01P5/20, G01P13/04 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G01P5/001 (EP,US);
G01P13/04 (EP,US);
G01P13/045 (EP,US);
G01P5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN STRÖMUNGSMESSUNG | [2009/25] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL FLOW MEASUREMENT | [2009/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE FLUX TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19911277 (LAVISION GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,20,21,39 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, paragraph 1 *; | [YD]WO03017000 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [YD] 1 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 3; figure 1c; claim 1 *; | [Y] - STOLZ W ET AL, "IN-PLANE DETERMINATION OF 3D-VELOCITY VECTORS USING PARTICLE TRACKING ANEMOMETRY (PTA)", EXPERIMENTS IN FLUIDS, SPRINGER, HEIDELBERG, DE, (19940601), vol. 17, no. 1/2, ISSN 0723-4864, pages 105 - 109, XP000477236 [Y] 1,20,21,39 * page 353, column R - page 357, column L * | [A] - WILLERT C E ET AL, "THREE-DIMENSIONAL PARTICLE IMAGING WITH A SINGLE CAMERA", EXPERIMENTS IN FLUIDS, SPRINGER, HEIDELBERG, DE, (19920401), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0723-4864, pages 353 - 358, XP000287710 [A] 1 * page 106, column L - page 107, column L; figures 1,2,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00193880 |