EP2086389 - MEDICAL HAND-HELD ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geuder AG Hertzstrasse 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEUDER, Volker Görresstrasse 67 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Ullrich & Naumann Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Luisenstrasse 14 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07817673.2 | 16.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007DE01838 | Priority number, date | DE20061051736 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006051736 | [2009/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052508 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086389 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00, A61B1/07, A61B5/00, A61B19/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (EP,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,US);
A61B2090/308 (EP,US);
A61B3/0008 (EP,US);
A61F9/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES HANDGERÄT ZUR BELEUCHTUNG | [2009/33] | English: | MEDICAL HAND-HELD ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2009/33] | French: | APPAREIL D'ECLAIRAGE MEDICAL PORTATIF | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004004846 (STEEN MARK E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-14,18-25,28,32,34,36,42 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0014] , [0025] - [0027] - [0031] , [0032] , [0036] - [0038]; figures 1,8,9; claims 1,2,4,5,13,14 * [Y] 15-17,26,27; | [X]US2005282102 (KERT JIMMIE [DK]) [X] 1-6,28-42 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0013] , [0022] - [0027] - [0040] - [0047] - [0051] , [0053] , [0078]; figures 1,5,7; claims 1-3,7,19,22,24-29,45 *; | [Y]DE10051057 (GEUDER AG [DE]) [Y] 15-17,26,27 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0017] , [0021]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1522290 (ALCON INC [CH]) [Y] 15-17,26,27 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0016] - [0018] - [0021] , [0022] , [0025]; figures 1-4; claims 1-14 * |