EP2078161 - A WIND ENERGY CONVERTER, A METHOD AND USE HEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2014/01] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Alsvej 21 8940 Randers SV / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Gerner Fusagervej 37 8382 Hinnerup / DK | 02 /
HENRIKSEN, Niels Martin Skoleparken 82 8330 Beder / DK | 03 /
CHRISTENSEN, Jan Bjerre Damsbrovej 39, Norring 8382 Hinnerup / DK | 04 /
JENSEN, Søren P. Svinget 8 6800 Varde / DK | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2009/29] | Henriksen, Michael, et al Patentgruppen A/S Arosgården Åboulevarden 31 8000 Århus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 07817868.8 | 02.11.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007DK00472 | Priority number, date | DK20060001431 | 03.11.2006 Original published format: DK 200601431 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008052557 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2078161 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078161 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F03D9/00, F03D11/00 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
F03D13/22 (EP,US);
F03D80/40 (EP,US);
F03D80/60 (EP,US);
F03D9/00 (EP);
F03D13/25 (US);
F05B2260/205 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | WINDENERGIEWANDLER, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2009/29] | English: | A WIND ENERGY CONVERTER, A METHOD AND USE HEREOF | [2009/29] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉOLIENNE, PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ ET UTILISATION DE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2007 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | NL | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.11.2007 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0177526 (AERODYN ENG GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 6, paragraph 2; figures 3,4; claim 5 *; | [DA]DE102004061391 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US6676122 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]DE10352023 (RITTAL RCS COMM SYSTEMS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]WO0068570 (NEG MICON AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007110718 (CLIPPER WINDPOWER TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [PX] 1-18 * page 9, line 18 - line 28; figure 2 * |