EP2087348 - Screening method using sample adsorption on filter paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/33] | SCREENING METHOD USING SAMPLE ADSORPTION ON FILTER PAPER | ||
[2013/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Statens Serum Institut Orestads Boulevard 5 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2011/35] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Statens Serum Institut Artillerivej 5 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUEN, Gunnar Wienerbyen 14 2830 Virum / DK | 02 /
HOUGAARD, David M. Parcelvej 133B 2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
SKOGSTRAND, Kristin Peder Lykjkesvej 54, 4th 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 04 /
JØRGENSEN, Charlotte Sværke Ellegaardsvej 22 4684 Holmegaard / DK | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/33] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07817923.1 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007DK00528 | Priority number, date | DK20060001587 | 01.12.2006 Original published format: DK 200601587 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008064684 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087348 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087348 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/521 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (US);
G01N33/66 (US);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N33/92 (US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/33] | G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | Screening-verfahren mit probenadsorption an filterpapier | [2013/52] | English: | Screening method using sample adsorption on filter paper | [2013/52] | French: | Procédé de criblage utilisant l'adsorption d'échantillon sur un papier filtre | [2013/52] |
Former [2009/33] | SCREENING-VERFAHREN MIT PROBENADSORPTION AN FILTERPAPIER | ||
Former [2009/33] | SCREENING METHOD USING SAMPLE ADSORPTION ON FILTER PAPER | ||
Former [2009/33] | PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE UTILISANT L'ADSORPTION D'ÉCHANTILLON SUR UN PAPIER FILTRE | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2013 | 13.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2007 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | IE | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | LU | 30.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.11.2007 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004121305 (WIEGAND ROGER CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 26, paragraph 284; example 2 * * page 27, paragraph 299; example 3 * * page 31; table 1 * * page 31 - page 33; table 2 * * page 33 - page 35; table 3 * * claim 1 * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 26, paragraph 284; example 2 * * page 27, paragraph 299; example 3 * * page 31; table 1 * * page 31 - page 33; table 2 * * page 33 - page 35; table 3 * * claim 1 * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 26, paragraph 284; example 2 * * page 27, paragraph 299; example 3 * * page 31; table 1 * * page 31 - page 33; table 2 * * page 33 - page 35; table 3 * * claim 1 *; | [DA] - SKOGSTRAND KRISTIN ET AL, "Simultaneous measurement of 25 inflammatory markers and neurotrophins in neonatal dried blood spots by immunoassay with xMAP technology.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY OCT 2005, (200510), vol. 51, no. 10, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1854 - 1866, XP002471829 [DA] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2005.052241 | [A] - MICHAEL H GELB ET AL, "Direct multiplex assay of enzymes in dried blood spots by tandem mass spectrometry for the newborn screening of lysosomal storage disorders", JOURNAL OF INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060401), vol. 29, no. 2-3, ISSN 1573-2665, pages 397 - 404, XP019392093 [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 403, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 5 * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 403, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 5 * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 403, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10545-006-0265-4 | [A] - PARKER S P ET AL, "Use of dried blood spots for the detection and confirmation of HTLV-I specific antibodies for epidemiological purposes.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY OCT 1995, (199510), vol. 48, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9746, pages 904 - 907, XP002472000 [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/jcp.48.10.904 | [A] - BEAUDETTE P ET AL, "Discovery stage pharmacokinetics using dried blood spots", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040925), vol. 809, no. 1, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 153 - 158, XP004523473 [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2004.06.018 | [A] - ABURUZ ET AL, "Dried blood spot liquid chromatography assay for therapeutic drug monitoring of metformin", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060307), vol. 832, no. 2, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 202 - 207, XP005334040 [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2005.12.050 | [A] - KOAL THERESE ET AL, "Quantification of antiretroviral drugs in dried blood spot samples by means of liquid chromatography/tandem mass spectrometry.", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY : RCM 2005, (2005), vol. 19, no. 21, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 2995 - 3001, XP002472001 [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.2158 |