EP2077773 - MEDICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERBE Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestrasse 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestrasse 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISELHART, Franz Christian-Fauser-Strasse 14 72770 Reutlingen / DE | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07818471.0 | 26.09.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007EP08388 | Priority number, date | DE20061047204 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006047204 | DE20061047215 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006047215 | DE20061046919 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006046919 | DE20061046920 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006046920 | DE20061056405 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056405 | DE20061059175 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059175 | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008040485 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2077773 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077773 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/28, A61B17/32, A61B18/14 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/295 (EP,US);
A61B18/1447 (EP,US);
A61B18/1482 (EP,US);
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00128 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0023 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00353 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2925 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2934 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2939 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2944 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2947 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1412 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1455 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2009/29] | English: | MEDICAL INSTRUMENT | [2009/29] | French: | INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 29.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2007 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | AT | 26.09.2012 | LU | 26.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LU | 26.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 26.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 26.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5431674 (BASILE PETER A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, lines 10-59 * * column 5, line 3 - column 7, line 28 * * column 8, lines 26-32 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE4421822 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 1a-1c,6a-6e,7c *; | [A]EP0717960 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 46 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 17 * * figures 3-6 *; | [A]WO2005072626 (AMS RES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 1, lines 8-13 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 27 * * page 14, line 7 - page 16, line 2 ** figures 2a,2b * |