EP2078169 - TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hasse & Wrede GmbH Georg-Knorr-Strasse 4 12681 Berlin / DE | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIENER, Wolfgang Krandorf 4 92431 Neunburg v.W. / DE | 02 /
KNOPF, Florian Kissinger Str. 14 14199 Berlin / DE | [2009/32] |
Former [2009/29] | 01 /
KIENER, Wolfgang Kreutzigerstr. 21 10247 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
KNOPF, Florian Starkenburger Str. 17 14163 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07818499.1 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007EP08416 | Priority number, date | DE20061046681 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006046681 | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008040491 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078169 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078169 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/121, F16F15/173 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
F16F15/1215 (EP);
F16F2226/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER | [2009/29] | English: | TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER | [2009/29] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS DE TORSION | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2007 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | IT | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 27.09.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4160390 (SPAETGENS THEODORE W) [X] 1-6 * column 4, lines 1-21,33-37; figures 3,6 * [A] 7-9; | [X]DE1526475 (GEISLINGER DR ING LEONHARD) [X] 1,4,6 * page 4; figure 2 *; | [X]DE2818295 (FEDERN KLAUS) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR1374234 (GEISLINGER DR ING LEONHARD) [A] 1-9 * figures 3-5 * | by applicant | US4160390 |