EP2079834 - MUTANT DNA POLYMERASES AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2014/33] |
Former [2009/30] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Keith A. 62 West Crescent Drive San Rafael, CA 94901 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Edward S. 1659 22nd Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 03 /
GELFAND, David Harrow 6208 Chelton Drive Oakland, CA 94111 / US | 04 /
FISS, Ellen 908 Polk Street Albany, CA 94706 / US | 05 /
SUKO, Shawn 4026 La Colina Road El Sobrabte, CA 94803 / US | 06 /
MYERS, Thomas W. 4700 Tassajara Road, Apt. 3317 Dublin 94568 / US | [2014/02] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
BAUER, Keith A. 62 West Crescent Drive San Rafael, CA 94901 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Edward S. 1659 22nd Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | |||
03 /
GELFAND, David Harrow 6208 Chelton Drive Oakland, CA 94111 / US | |||
04 /
FISS, Ellen 908 Polk Street Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
05 /
SUKO, Shawn 4026 La Colina Road El Sobrabte, CA 94803 / US | Application number, filing date | 07819100.4 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007EP09033 | Priority number, date | US20060852882P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 852882 P | US20070949732P | 13.07.2007 Original published format: US 949732 P | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008046612 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079834 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2079834 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/12 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
C12N9/1252 (EP,US);
C12N9/1276 (EP,US);
C12P19/34 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTANTE DNA-POLYMERASEN UND DAMIT VERBUNDENE VERFAHREN | [2009/30] | English: | MUTANT DNA POLYMERASES AND RELATED METHODS | [2009/30] | French: | ADN POLYMÉRASES MUTANTES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 17.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2007 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | LU | 18.10.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.10.2007 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005045015 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1-28 * "3C12" protein; page 73 *; | [Y]EP0745675 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [Y] 1-28 * page 2, lines 27-30 *; | [Y]EP1152062 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-28 * paragraph [0064] *; | [Y]WO0151621 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1152062 | US6602695 | WO9206200 | US4889818 | WO9709451 | US6228628 | US6346379 | US7030220 | US6881559 | US6794177 | US6468775 | US2004005599 | US2002012970 | US2006078928 | US2004115639 | US5455170 | US5674738 | - BEESE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 352 - 355 | - PATEL ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 5351 - 5363 | - WANG ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 89, pages 1087 - 1099 | - AKHMETZJANOV; VAKHITOV, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 20, page 5839 | - UEMORI ET AL., J BIOCHEM (TOKYO, (1993), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 401 - 410 |