Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8639867 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B2 | US2010088537 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | WO2007EP09035 | 18.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2109963 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | B1 | EP2109963 | 21.10.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | WO2007EP09035 | 18.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101529820B | 19.06.2013 | B | CN101529820 | 09.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | WO2007EP09035 | 18.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007050280 | 19.11.2009 | B4 | DE102007050280 | 16.10.2008 | A8 | DE102007050280 | 08.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | DE102007050280 | 18.10.2007 | DE102007063686 | 18.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007063686 | 05.08.2010 | B4 | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | DE102007050280 | 18.10.2007 | DE102007063686 | 18.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202007019510U | 15.02.2013 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | DE202007019510 | 18.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008052668 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2009 | A3 | WO2008052668 | 08.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102394802B | 17.06.2015 | B | CN102394802 | 28.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006052297 | 03.11.2006 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 07.02.2012 |