EP2087583 - TRACTION DRIVE OF A RAIL VEHICLE FOR DRIVING AND GENERATIVE BRAKING WITH LOAD CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80909 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄHLE, Falk Ludwig-Thoma-Str. 5 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
FRIESEN, Ulf Bürgermeister-Schneider-Weg 23 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 03 /
SCHMUCKER, Josef Josef-Heppner-Str. 6 82049 Pullach / DE | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula, et al Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Mattusch, Gundula, et al Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07819311.7 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007EP09259 | Priority number, date | DE20061051319 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006051319 | [2009/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052694 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087583 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087583 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02P3/26, B60L7/10, B60L7/16, B60L7/24, B60T8/1761 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H02P6/24 (EP,US);
B60L7/06 (EP,US);
B60L7/08 (EP,US);
B60L7/16 (EP,US);
B60L7/22 (EP,US);
B60L7/24 (EP,US);
B60L7/26 (EP,US);
B60T8/1705 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | TRAKTIONSANTRIEB EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGS ZUM ANTREIBEN UND ZUM GENERATORISCHEN BREMSEN MIT LASTKORREKTUR | [2009/33] | English: | TRACTION DRIVE OF A RAIL VEHICLE FOR DRIVING AND GENERATIVE BRAKING WITH LOAD CORRECTION | [2009/33] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT PAR TRACTION POUR ENTRAÎNER ET FREINER ÉLECTRIQUEMENT UN VÉHICULE SUR RAILS AVEC CORRECTION DE CHARGE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | IE | 19.05.2010 | LT | 19.05.2010 | LV | 19.05.2010 | MT | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | PL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | LU | 25.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | HU | 20.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/14] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
LU | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IT | 25.10.2010 | ||
LU | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IT | 25.10.2010 | ||
LU | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 19.05.2010 | |
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 19.05.2010 | |
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CZ | 19.05.2010 | |
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 19.05.2010 | |
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0704961 (KONE OY [FI]) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1-3; claims 1,3,4 *; | [Y]WO03050940 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]DE102004032680 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] , [0024] , [0033]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0016] , [0032] * [A] 4-12; | [A]DE102004032679 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3* figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10160612 | DE102004032680 |