EP2087585 - OPEN-LOOP AND/OR CLOSED-LOOP CONTROL OF A 3-PHASE POWER CONVERTER FOR THE OPERATION OF AN ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Robert Am Königsbecher 15 76684 Östringen / DE | 02 /
KRAFKA, Peter Eichenweg 21 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 03 /
RAMPE, Michael Holzweg 38 69469 Weinheim-Hohensachsen / DE | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07819380.2 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007EP09337 | Priority number, date | DE20061052042 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006052042 | [2009/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052714 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087585 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087585 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H02P23/30 (EP,US);
H02P21/22 (EP,US);
H02P21/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG UND/ODER REGELUNG EINES 3-PHASEN-STROMRICHTERS FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINER ASYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2009/33] | English: | OPEN-LOOP AND/OR CLOSED-LOOP CONTROL OF A 3-PHASE POWER CONVERTER FOR THE OPERATION OF AN ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE | [2009/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET/OU DE RÉGULATION D'UN CONVERTISSEUR TRIPHASÉ POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE ASYNCHRONE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 12.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IE | 03.03.2010 | LT | 03.03.2010 | LV | 03.03.2010 | MT | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | PL | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | IS | 03.07.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | LU | 19.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
MT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
TR | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
IT | 19.10.2010 | ||
LU | 19.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
MT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
IT | 19.10.2010 | ||
LU | 19.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
MT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
IT | 19.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
MT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IT | 19.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IT | 19.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA] - GRIVA, G.; PROFUMO, F.; ABRATE, M.; TENCONI, A.; BERRUTI, D., "Wide speed range DTC drive performance with new flux weakening control", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, PESC 1998 RECORD, (19980517), vol. 2, pages 1599 - 1604, XP002467493 [X] 1-3,6-18,20-25,27,28 * the whole document * * page 1599, column 1 * [A] 4,5,19,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1998.703392 | [YA] - TRIPATHI, A.; KHAMBADKONE, A.M.; PANDA, S.K., "Dynamic torque control performance of the Direct Flux Control scheme in field weakening range", THE 29TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS SOCIETY, 2003. IECON '03, (20030902), vol. 1, pages 220 - 225, XP002467494 [Y] 1-3,6-18,20-25,27,28 * page 221, column 1; figures 1,2 * * page 223, column 1 * * figures 7-12 * [A] 4,5,19,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.2003.1279983 | [YA] - JOONG-HUI LEE; CHANG-GYUN KIM; MYUNG-JOONG YOUN, "A dead-beat type digital controller for the direct torque control of an induction motor", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, (200209), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 739 - 746, XP002467495 [Y] 1-3,6-18,20-25,27,28 * page 740 - page 742 * * figures 5,10 * [A] 4,5,19,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2002.802174 |