EP2089633 - TRUNCATED CONE-TYPE ROLLING BODY AND TAPERED ROLLER BEARING COMPRISING ROLLING BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CY, HU, MT, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB SKF Hornsgatan 1 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUG, Udo Josef-Greisong-Strasse 4 97531 Theres / DE | 02 /
OLSCHEWSKI, Armin Stösselstrasse 8 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 03 /
STUBENRAUCH, Arno Am Reichetlein 19 97491 Aidhausen / DE | 04 /
DOP, Gerrit-Jan Koremolen 119 NL-2406 KE Alphen aan den Rijn / NL | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2015/20] |
Former [2009/34] | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH, Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07819386.9 | 27.10.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007EP09343 | Priority number, date | DE20061052044 | 04.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052044 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052717 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089633 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089633 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C23/08, F16C27/04, F16C33/36 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
F16C23/08 (EP);
F16C33/366 (EP);
F16C2240/40 (EP);
F16C27/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | F16C33/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KEGELSTUMPFARTIGER WÄLZKÖRPER UND KEGELROLLENLAGERUNG MIT DEN WÄLZKÖRPERN | [2009/34] | English: | TRUNCATED CONE-TYPE ROLLING BODY AND TAPERED ROLLER BEARING COMPRISING ROLLING BODIES | [2009/34] | French: | CORPS DE ROULEMENT TRONCONIQUE ET ROULEMENT À ROULEAUX CONIQUES COMPORTANT DE TELS CORPS DE ROULEMENT | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2007 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | AT | 27.10.2015 | IE | 27.10.2015 | LU | 27.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/18] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
AT | 27.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1397142 (ARVID PALMGREN NILS) [Y] 17,19,20 * figure - *; | [YA]US2215701 (OTTO HENSELMAN) [Y] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1-4; | [YA]GB1327646 (ROLLWAY BEARING CO INC) [Y] 3-5,9 * the whole document * [A] 1,2; | [A]JP2000170771 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [XAY]US2005229395 (PROSCHEL EDGAR [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-13,15,16,18 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016]; figure -; claims 3,4,8,9 * [A] 14 [Y] 3-6,9,17,19,20 |