EP2084565 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING OPTICAL POWER OF A LIGHT BEAM PRODUCED IN A MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Curie 26, rue d'Ulm 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Institut Curie 26, rue d'Ulm 75005 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBLARD, François 3, rue Laplace 75005 Paris / FR | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Pontet, Bernard Pontet Allano & Associés Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint Aubin 91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Pontet, Bernard Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, Rue Jean Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/30] | Pontet, Bernard Pontet Allano & Associés 25, rue Jean Rostand Parc-Orsay-Université 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07819630.0 | 06.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007EP09612 | Priority number, date | EP20060291742 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06291742 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008055656 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084565 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G01J1/42 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
G02B21/0096 (EP,US);
G01J1/30 (EP,US);
G01J1/4257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER OPTISCHEN LEISTUNG EINES IN EINEM MIKROSKOP ERZEUGTEN LICHTSTRAHLS | [2009/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING OPTICAL POWER OF A LIGHT BEAM PRODUCED IN A MICROSCOPE | [2009/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MESURER LA PUISSANCE OPTIQUE D'UN FAISCEAU LUMINEUX PRODUIT DANS UN MICROSCOPE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4132891 (LEITER HERBERT) [X] 20-25 * abstract * [A] 1-19; | [A]US2005161593 (KITAHARA AKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [DA]US2004238719 (MOELLMANN KYRA [DE], et al) [DA] 1-25 * abstract * | by applicant | US2004238719 | US2005161593 | US4132891 | JP2003195172 |