EP2091813 - HIGH-LIFT SYSTEM ON THE WING OF AN AIRCRAFT, AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2011/16] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZHAUSEN, Torsten Hohe Luft 4 21698 Bargstedt / DE | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Schatt, Markus F. Schatt IP Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Rindermarkt 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Schatt, Markus F. Schatt IP Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Rindermarkt 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Schatt, Markus F. Schatt IP Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Rindermarkt 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07819771.2 | 12.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007EP09785 | Priority number, date | DE20061053259 | 11.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053259 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008058695 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091813 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091813 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/22, B64C9/24 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
B64C9/22 (EP,US);
B64C9/24 (EP,US);
B64C2009/143 (EP,US);
Y02T50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | HOCHAUFTRIEBSSYSTEM AM FLÜGEL EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGS UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/35] | English: | HIGH-LIFT SYSTEM ON THE WING OF AN AIRCRAFT, AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION | [2009/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GRANDE LEVÉE SUR L'AILE D'UN AVION, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SON FONCTIONNEMENT | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2010 | 28.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of invitation to pay additional claims fees (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.2012 | Payment of the additional claims fees | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2007 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | IT | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MT | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | ES | 15.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | IE | 12.11.2012 | LU | 12.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
LU | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006108579 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8-14,16,24-26,28-35,38-40 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006169847 (KONINGS CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]US2117607 (GRISWOLD ROGER W) [A] 1-40 * the whole document * |