|
30.04.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
26 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |