EP2044025 - QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2012/40] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states NOVARTIS AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHSE, Olivier Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4056 Basel / CH | 02 /
MONNIER, Stéphanie 6 Le Parc F-68190 Raedersheim / FR | 03 /
REBER, Jean-Louis Rue de la Promenade 14 F-68680 Kembs / FR | [2009/30] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
LOHSE, Olivier Rue des Sapins 18 F-68170 Rixheim / FR | ||
02 /
MONNIER, Stéphanie 6 Le Parc F-68190 Raedersheim / FR | |||
03 /
REBER, Jean-Louis Rue de la Promenade 14 F-68680 Kembs / FR | Representative(s) | McLean, Craig Sutherland Novartis Pjarma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | McLean, Craig Sutherland Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2009/15] | McLean, Craig Sutherland Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07819899.1 | 02.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP56632 | Priority number, date | GB20060013156 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0613156 | GB20060013158 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0613158 | GB20060013159 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0613159 | GB20060013160 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0613160 | EP20060117129 | 13.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06117129 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000839 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044025 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044025 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/26, A61K31/4704, A61P11/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C07D215/26 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A61K31/4704 (KR,NO);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | HR | 30.01.2009 | Title | German: | CHINOLINONDERIVATE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DARAUS | [2009/15] | English: | QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2009/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOLINES ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DE CES DÉRIVÉS | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 03.10.2012 | [2021/03] |
Former [2016/35] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0075114 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO0245703 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2004076422 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2004087142 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2005110402 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [PX]WO2006128674 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | by applicant | WO0075114 | WO0245703 | WO2004076422 | WO2004087142 | WO2005110402 | WO2006128674 |