EP2064371 - METHOD FOR ELECTROCHEMICALLY COATING OR STRIPPING THE COATING FROM COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JABADO, Rene Sylter Str. 7 14199 Berlin / DE | 02 /
JENSEN, Jens Dahl Ulmenallee 53 14050 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KRÜGER, Ursus Krampnitzer Weg 11 14089 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KÖRTVELYESSY, Daniel Grünspechtweg 19 13469 Berlin / DE | 05 /
LÜTHEN, Volkmar Beckerstr. 4 12157 Berlin / DE | 06 /
REICHE, Ralph Bulgenbachweg 15 13465 Berlin / DE | 07 /
RINDLER, Michael Waldstr. 38 15566 Schöneiche / DE | 08 /
ULLRICH, Raymond Habichtsteig 18 14621 Schönwalde / DE | [2009/23] | Application number, filing date | 07820130.8 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007EP59525 | Priority number, date | DE20061044416 | 18.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006044416 | [2009/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008034739 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064371 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02, C25D5/16, C25D5/18, C25D17/12, B23H3/00, B23H3/04, F01D5/14 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
C25D5/022 (EP,US);
C25D17/12 (EP,US);
C25D5/16 (EP,US);
C25D5/18 (EP,US);
C25D5/605 (EP,US);
C25D5/617 (EP,US);
C25D5/623 (EP,US);
C25D5/625 (EP,US);
C25F5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN BE- ODER ENTSCHICHTEN VON BAUTEILEN | [2009/23] | English: | METHOD FOR ELECTROCHEMICALLY COATING OR STRIPPING THE COATING FROM COMPONENTS | [2009/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT OU D'ENLÈVEMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE DE COUCHES SUR DES ORGANES | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2005074934 (GUYOT JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [I] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] * * figure - *; | [X]US5965006 (BAEGE ROLAND [CH], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 1,7 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 19 * * column 7, lines 31-34 * * claim 17 *; | [A]WO2005056226 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 1,2,4 * * claim - *; | [A]US2004065556 (RUMPF THOMAS [AT]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * figures 4,6 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0033] , [0034] *; | [A]WO2006032562 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 15 *; | [A]WO2006027311 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * figure - * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2 *; | [A]US5122242 (SLYSH PAUL [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * figure - *; | [A]DE3835213 (SCHIFFER DIETRICH F W [DE]) [A] 5,7 * figures 24-26 * * claims 1,25,29 * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 16 * |