blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2068880

EP2068880 - METHOD FOR TREATING CANCER HARBORING EGFR MUTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.02.2015  [2015/08]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
For:DE 
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
For:DE 
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2009/25]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
For:DE 
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SOLCA, Flavio
Gesslgasse 10/6
1230 Vienna / AT
 [2009/25]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/40]Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2012/15]Hammann, Heinz
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2009/48]Hammann, Heinz
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2009/25]Hammann, Heinz
c/o Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, Postfach 200
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date07820235.514.09.2007
[2009/25]
WO2007EP59735
Priority number, dateEP2006012085618.09.2006         Original published format: EP 06120856
EP2007010150531.01.2007         Original published format: EP 07101505
[2009/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008034776
Date:27.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2068880
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2068880
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/517, A61P35/00
[2009/25]
CPC:
A61K31/517 (EP,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP,KR)
C-Set:
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN MIT EGFR-MUTATIONEN[2009/25]
English:METHOD FOR TREATING CANCER HARBORING EGFR MUTATIONS[2009/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER PRÉSENTANT DES MUTATIONS EGFR[2009/25]
Entry into regional phase20.04.2009National basic fee paid 
20.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/25]
19.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2012Fee for grant paid
29.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2013  22.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ladendorf, Oliver, et al, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/24]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2013  22.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ladendorf, Oliver, et al, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2013/09]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2013   
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ladendorf, Oliver, et al, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
22.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/49]
04.07.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.07.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.08.2010Request for further processing filed
06.08.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH11.04.2012
LI11.04.2012
[2015/08]
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004096224  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 69, line 15 - page 70, line 18 * * page 19, paragraph 1 *;
 [PX]WO2007054551  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [PX] 1-28 * claims 1-33 *;
 [PX]  - SOLCA ET AL, "567 POSTER Efficacy of BIBW 2992, an irreversible dual EGFR/HER2 receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitor, in combination with cytotoxic agents", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER. SUPPLEMENT, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (200611), vol. 4, no. 12, ISSN 1359-6349, page 172, XP005810786 [PX] 1-28 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6349(06)70572-9
 [PX]  - PLUMMER ET AL, "573 POSTER Phase I study of BIBW2992, an oral irreversible dual EGFR/HER2 inhibitor, showing activity in tumors with mutated EGFR", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER. SUPPLEMENT, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (200611), vol. 4, no. 12, ISSN 1359-6349, pages 173 - 174, XP005810792 [PX] 1-28 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6349(06)70578-X
Examination   - SUBRAMANIAN ET AL, "BIBW 2992 in non-small cell lung cancer", EXPERT OPIN INVEST DRUGS, (10110201), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 415 - 422
    - SEQUIST LECIA V ET AL, "Neratinib, an irreversible pan-ErbB receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitor: results of a phase II trial in patients with advanced non-small-cell lung cancer.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (20100620), Database accession no. NLM20479403
    - JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 20 JUN 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20479403, (20100620), vol. 28, no. 18, ISSN 1527-7755, pages 3076 - 3083
by applicantWO0250043
 WO2004096224
 WO2005037824
 WO2006084058
 WO2007054551
    - SCHILLER JH ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2002), vol. 346, pages 92 - 98
    - CARPENTER ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 56, pages 881 - 914
    - HUMPHREY ET AL., PNAS ( USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 4207 - 4211
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.