EP2178744 - SOLAR-HYBRID CATAMARAN BOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Code-X AG Naumatthalde 11 6045 Meggen / CH | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAUER, Peter Naumatthalde 11 CH-6045 Meggen / CH | 02 /
SUTER, Eskil Landenbergweg 16 CH-8488 Turbenthal / CH | 03 /
SUTER, David Plattenstrase 78 CH-8335 Hittnau / CH | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 07820278.5 | 18.09.2007 | [2010/17] | WO2007EP59813 | Priority number, date | DE20071037828 | 10.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007037828 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009021559 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178744 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/20, B63B1/12, B63B1/20 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
B63B17/02 (EP);
B63H2021/171 (EP);
B63H2021/205 (EP);
Y02T70/5236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | SOLAR-HYBRID-KATAMARANBOOT | [2010/17] | English: | SOLAR-HYBRID CATAMARAN BOAT | [2010/17] | French: | CATAMARAN SOLAIRE-HYBRIDE | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0716012 (SUBIBOR SA [ES]) [Y] 1-3,5,8 * column 3, lines 45-59; figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]DE4105318 (FICHT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,8 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 18; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US6855016 (JANSEN PATRICK LEE [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,8 * column 8, lines 49-61; figure 4 *; | [Y]FR2796036 (CREA 2000 [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1270401 (DONATELLI CARLO [IT]) [A] 4,7 * abstract *; | [A]US6350164 (GRIFFITH SR THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 6,8 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 6; figures 1,2,11,12 * |