Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
09.05.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.11.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.10.2010 | Change - extension states | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
10.08.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.03.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
26.03.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
16.03.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.02.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.02.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.02.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.03.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.02.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.01.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication |