Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009021561 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 | WO2007EP59837 | 18.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009021560 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 | WO2007EP59836 | 18.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009021559 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 | WO2007EP59813 | 18.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2176122 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | B1 | EP2176122 | 21.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 | WO2007EP59837 | 18.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2178744 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 | WO2007EP59813 | 18.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE529331T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 | WO2007EP59837 | 18.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2372115T | 16.01.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102007037828 | 10.08.2007 |