EP2081786 - BLIND ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G + B Pronova GmbH Lustheide 85 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states G + B Pronova Gmbh Lustheide 85 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMEYER, Stefan, Prof. Dr. Kollwitzstr. 30 41539 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
MEBBEN, Sandra Otto-Wels-Str. 8 30451 Hannover / DE | 03 /
ZOZGORNIK, Steffen Burscheider Str. 505 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
ALTMEYER, Stefan, Prof. Kurze Strasse 20 40670 Meerbusch / DE | ||
02 /
MEBBEN, Sandra Palmstr. 30 50672 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
ZOZGORNIK, Steffen Burscheider Str. 505 51381 Leverkusen / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander Patent Attorneys von Kreisler Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07820698.4 | 28.09.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007EP60311 | Priority number, date | DE20061050119 | 25.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050119 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008049708 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081786 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081786 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B60J3/0204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VERSCHATTUNGSELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2009/31] | English: | BLIND ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [2009/31] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'OBSCURCISSEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.2010 | 30.09.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | IT | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | AT | 28.09.2012 | IE | 28.09.2012 | LU | 28.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
AT | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
LU | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
AT | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
AT | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP1780062 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1-13 * page 6 - page 10 *; | [A]EP0856615 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3739062 (HOLTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]EP1767964 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [PA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4863224 (AFIAN VIKTOR V [SU], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4433629 | EP1780062 |