EP1926450 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CERAMIC MOLDED PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHAN, Marc Holzgasse 31 79539 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
THIEL, Norbert Schweizerblick 25 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 03 /
BOJEMÜLLER, Enno Ludwig-Herr-Strasse 37 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07820923.6 | 04.10.2007 | [2008/23] | WO2007EP60546 | Priority number, date | EP20060020897 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: EP 06020897 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008040780 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926450 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926450 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/083, A61K6/06, C04B41/52, C04B41/89 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
A61C13/083 (EP,US);
A61C13/0003 (EP,US);
A61K6/76 (EP,US);
A61K6/807 (EP,US);
A61K6/818 (EP,US);
A61K6/822 (EP,US);
A61K6/824 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
B28B1/268 (EP,US);
A61C13/12 (EP);
Y10T428/249956 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249957 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249975 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KERAMISCHEN FORMTEILS | [2008/23] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CERAMIC MOLDED PART | [2008/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIECE MOULEE EN CERAMIQUE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | IE | 16.12.2009 | LT | 16.12.2009 | LV | 16.12.2009 | MT | 16.12.2009 | PL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | IS | 16.04.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
MT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
MT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | LT | 16.12.2009 | |
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2463551 (SIMON MYERSON, et al) [A] * column 6, line 17 - line 49 *; | [A]WO0247616 (RAUTER VITA ZAHNFABRIK [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2002152768 (LOXLEY TED A [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0072] *; | [A]WO2005103339 (HAFNER C GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document * |