13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
31.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
27.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
11.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
06.03.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
26.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.02.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.12.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.12.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
19.11.2014 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
11.10.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
26.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.08.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.04.2012 |
First examination report |
|
09.04.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.12.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
13.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
31.07.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
26.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|