EP2097194 - METHOD AND UNIT FOR PRODUCTION OF A CAST COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNA BDW technolgies GmbH Im Wiegenfeld 10 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Magna BDW technolgies GmbH Im Wiegenfeld 10 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states BDW technologies GmbH Postfach 11 82 85568 Markt Schwaben / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜST, Jürgen Eschenstrasse 32 85435 Erding / DE | 02 /
WESTERHEIDE, Dirk O.E. Tonweg 1 33775 Versmold / DE | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele Magna International Europe AG Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 VG-Nord 8041 Graz / AT | [2012/21] |
Former [2009/37] | Schwarz, Michael Stefan Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Patentanwälte Balanstrasse 57 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07821214.9 | 11.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007EP60847 | Priority number, date | DE20061049869 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049869 | [2009/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008049739 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097194 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B22D47/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B22D47/00 (EP,US);
B22D31/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GUSSBAUTEILS | [2009/37] | English: | METHOD AND UNIT FOR PRODUCTION OF A CAST COMPONENT | [2009/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT COULÉ | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 14.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006000571 (CRAFTON SCOTT P [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO02063051 (CONS ENG CO INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * page 4, line 13 - page 17, line 22 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2005014207 (CASTALLOY MFG PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12,16,18-20,22-25 * page 2, line 23 - page 7, line 18 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH071111 (KOSEI ARUMINIYUUMU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-7,10-12,16 * abstract * | Examination | - WILLIAM A. WIESMUELLER, SR., "Robots in the real World of Die Casting Foundries", ROBOTICS ENGINEERING, (198603), no. 3, pages 5 - 8, XP001315342 |