EP2081450 - LONG-TERM FEED - CANCER PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE-HENAND, Hervé 15 Rue Lamartine 78100 Saint Germain En Laye / FR | 02 /
MURBACH, François 150 Rue des Fontanettes 01220 Divonne / FR | 03 /
JEDWAB, Michael Chemin de Bochardon 5 1012 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
ROESSLE, Claudia Chemin de la Brume 6 1110 Morges / CH | 05 /
CYNOBER, Luc 4 Av. de l'Observatoire 75270 Paris / FR | 06 /
SCHNEIDER, Stéphane Hopital de l'Archet 06202 Nice Cedex 3 / FR | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Stephen, Paula-Marie, et al Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Stephen, Paula-Marie, et al Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2012/40] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Lock, Graham James Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07821473.1 | 17.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007EP61108 | Priority number, date | US20060862159P | 19.10.2006 Original published format: US 862159 P | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008046870 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081450 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A23L1/305, A61K31/19 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/155 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/0628, A23V2250/062, A23V2250/5424, A23V2250/18, A23V2250/51, A23V2250/156, A23V2250/70 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | DAUERNAHRUNG FÜR EINEN KREBSPATIENTEN | [2009/31] | English: | LONG-TERM FEED - CANCER PATIENT | [2009/31] | French: | ALIMENTATION PAR SONDE À LONG TERME POUR PATIENT CANCÉREUX | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 18.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9942001 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 14,16-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0060953 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 14,16-25 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2795921 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH]) [A] 14,16-25* table 1 *; | [A]WO2004026294 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-13,15,26-37 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004032653 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6-13,28,29,31-37 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004103383 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-13,28,29,31-37 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 1; tables I-II * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 3 * * page 12, line 1 - line 32; example 1; claims 1,3,7,11,13,15 *; | [A]WO2005039318 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9-13,28,29,31,33-37 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 30 * * page 6, line 16 - page 10, line 22 * * page 12, line 25 - line 28 * * page 13, line 5 - line 22; claims 1,5-11 * |