EP2084212 - APPLICATION OF COIL TUBE EVAPORATORS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Robert Triftweg 25 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
BECKER, Jens Lessingstrasse 20 67304 Eisenberg / DE | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/32] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07821551.4 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007EP61187 | Priority number, date | EP20060122862 | 24.10.2006 Original published format: EP 06122862 | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008049786 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084212 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084212 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/04, C08G69/16, C08G69/18, C08G69/46 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
C08G69/16 (EP,KR,US);
B01D1/02 (KR);
C08G69/04 (KR);
C08G69/18 (KR);
C08G69/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON WENDELROHRVERDAMPFERN BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON POLYAMIDEN | [2009/32] | English: | APPLICATION OF COIL TUBE EVAPORATORS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYAMIDES | [2009/32] | French: | UTILISATION D'ÉVAPORATEUR À TUBE HÉLICOÏDAL DANS LA PRODUCTION DE POLYAMIDES | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 25.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IE | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0459206 (BASF CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - line 20 * * examples 1-6 *; | [AD]WO9708224 (POLYMER ENG GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 5 - line 25 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5703204 (GITTINGER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - line 44 *; | [A]WO9910408 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 20 - line 22 * * figure 1 *; | [AD]DE19925906 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 2, line 56 - line 64 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE10335451 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0020] * |