Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8263733 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2012 | B2 | US2010317810 | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101444965B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2014 | B1 | KR20090083345 | 03.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5312338B | Global Dossier | 09.10.2013 | B2 | JP2010507701 | 11.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2084212 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | B1 | EP2084212 | 05.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | EP07821551 | 19.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE492584T | 15.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0718502 | 26.06.2018 | B1 | BRPI0718502 | 03.12.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2666422 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101528811B | 18.01.2012 | B | CN101528811 | 09.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502007006056D1 | 03.02.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009004018 | 27.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2084212T | 31.05.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP61187 | 19.10.2007 | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | EP07821551 | 19.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008049786 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2357335T | 25.04.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06122862 | 24.10.2006 |