EP2082213 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PARAMETERS OF A BULK MATERIAL PARTICLE FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haver & Boecker OHG Carl-Haver-Platz 59302 Oelde / DE | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREIHERR VON HODENBERG, Marquardt Dianalust 9 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 07821586.0 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007EP61222 | Priority number, date | DE20061049517 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049517 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008046914 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082213 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N15/02 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G01N15/0227 (EP);
G01N21/3563 (EP);
G01N21/359 (EP);
G01N21/85 (EP);
G01N2015/0096 (EP);
G01N2015/0294 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON PARAMETERN EINES SCHÜTTGUT-PARTIKELSTROMES | [2009/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PARAMETERS OF A BULK MATERIAL PARTICLE FLOW | [2009/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES D'UN FLUX DE PARTICULES DE MATIÈRE EN VRAC | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004051237 (DU PONT [US]; GLEICH STEVEN IRWIN [US]; SCOTT DAVID MARK [US]; SUNSHIN) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 9 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 23, line 6 - page 24, line 30 * * page 29, line 11 - page 30, line 4 * * page 35, line 5 - line 24 *; | [Y]EP0195420 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 31 *; | [Y]EP1302764 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US5448069 (TOBLER HANS [CH] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0184115 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]; JOHNSEN OLE MAGNE [NO]; JOERGENSEN TERJE [NO]; RE) [Y] 2-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 6 - line 12 *; | [A]WO9830886 (BUSSMANN STEFAN [CA]; HARRIGAN KATHLEEN A [CA]; HODGINS BRUCE [CA]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 3 * * page 25, line 25 - page 26, line 19 *; | [PY]DE102005055825 (BASF AG [DE]) [PY] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] , [0062] , [0063] , [0065] , [0095] , [0099] - [0102] * | [A] - COPPERS M ET AL, "OPTISCHE ONLINE-PARTIKELANALYSE ALS PRODUKTIONSUEBERWACHUNG IM INDUSTRIELLEN EINSATZ OPTICAL ONLINE PARTICLE ANALYSIS FOR PRODUCTION MONITORING IN INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS ANALYSE OPTIQUE EN LIGNE DE PARTICULES POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DE LA PRODUCTION A L'", AT - AUFBEREITUNGS TECHNIK - MINERAL PROCESSING, BAUVERLAG, G]TERSLOH, DE, (200507), vol. 46, no. 7, ISSN 1434-9302, pages 42 - 47, XP001232016 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1894461 |