EP2102464 - METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING FLUID MEDIA AT LOW TEMPERATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAEBERER, Rainer Eichenstr 32 75015 Bretten / DE | 02 /
HORN, Matthias Unterer Schlosshof 1 71691 Freiberg / DE | [2009/39] | Application number, filing date | 07821652.0 | 22.10.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP61288 | Priority number, date | DE20061060314 | 20.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006060314 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074543 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102464 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102464 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F16L53/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F16L53/38 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/10 (EP,US);
F01N2610/14 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFÖRDERN FLUIDER MEDIEN BEI TIEFEN TEMPERATUREN | [2009/39] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING FLUID MEDIA AT LOW TEMPERATURES | [2009/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ACHEMINER DES AGENTS FLUIDES À BASSES TEMPÉRATURES | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | LU | 22.10.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
LU | 22.10.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004026866 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE102004062603 (EICHENAUER HEIZELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB2423686 (ALLEN GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [PX]EP1818588 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,6,7,9-11 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1,3,4 * | by applicant | EP0982884 |