EP2092317 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A MEASUREMENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINSHAGEN, Holger Traenkgasse 2a 96052 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
DIEHL, Lothar Panoramastr. 73/2 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2009/35] | Application number, filing date | 07821686.8 | 23.10.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007EP61322 | Priority number, date | DE20061053808 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053808 | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008058834 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092317 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/406, G01K7/18, G01K7/26, G05D23/24 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
G01K7/183 (EP,US);
G01K7/26 (EP,US);
G01N27/4067 (EP,US);
G05D23/2401 (EP,US);
G01K2205/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER TEMPERATUR EINES MESSFÜHLERS | [2009/35] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A MEASUREMENT SENSOR | [2009/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UNE SONDE DE MESURE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 02.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0695983 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 16; figures 4-7 *; | [A]DE4106308 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2004047396 (NOMURA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0147] , [0160] , [0170] *; | [DA]DE19838456 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |