EP2089360 - SPIROINDOLINONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jin-Jun 50 Highmount Avenue Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhuming 59 Wesley Road Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Beyermann, Jochen Carl F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CLP - Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2011/19] |
Former [2009/34] | Bastian, Werner Maria, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07822025.8 | 30.10.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007EP61671 | Priority number, date | US20060858039P | 09.11.2006 Original published format: US 858039 P | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008055812 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089360 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089360 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/54 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
C07D209/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | SPIROINDOLINONDERIVATE | [2009/34] | English: | SPIROINDOLINONE DERIVATIVES | [2009/34] | French: | DERIVES DE SPIROINDOLIDONE | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | HU | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | MT | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | IE | 30.10.2011 | LU | 30.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.10.2011 | ||
LU | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.10.2011 | ||
LU | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.10.2011 | ||
LU | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0947511 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1,2 * tables 1,2 *; | [A] - HANS-DIETER ARNDT, DR., "Kleine Moleküle als Transkriptionsmodulatoren", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE VOLUME 118, ISSUE 28 , PAGES 4664 - 4673, (20060703), XP002465843 [A] 1,2 * page 4668 - page 4669 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.200600285 | Examination | WO2008141917 |