EP2081866 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HYDROGEN AND THE USE THEREOF AND A PROCESS FOR THE OPERATION OF A INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIJK, Eric c/o ECN Westerduinweg 3 1755 ZG Petten / NL | 02 /
MONTEL, Stephan Badhuisweg 3 1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
WNUCK, Wayne, G. 30 Spinners Run South Windsor, Connecticut 06074 / US | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2009/31] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 07822071.2 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007EP61722 | Priority number, date | EP20060123280 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: EP 06123280 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053006 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081866 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38, B01D53/79, B01D53/86, B01D53/90, B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F01N3/20 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
C01B3/386 (EP);
B01D53/9409 (EP);
B01J8/0221 (EP);
F01N3/0814 (EP);
F01N3/0842 (EP);
F01N3/206 (EP);
B01D2251/202 (EP);
B01J2208/00716 (EP);
C01B2203/0261 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/044 (EP);
C01B2203/047 (EP);
C01B2203/0485 (EP);
C01B2203/1047 (EP);
C01B2203/1247 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON WASSERSTOFF UND VERWENDUNG DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2009/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HYDROGEN AND THE USE THEREOF AND A PROCESS FOR THE OPERATION OF A INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2009/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROGÈNE ET SON UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 13.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO2005042934 (HYDROGENSOURCE LLC [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004050035 (SMALING RUDOLF M [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005022450 (TAN CHER-DIP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004098977 (KUPE JOACHIM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006092392 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005053534 (LIU KE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002038542 (AKAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003217729 (KAUPERT ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2473525 (HOOP JOHN G) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2873173 (JOHN NEUMEYER MARTIN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6486087 (SALING CARLO [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0146069 | US6702960 | EP1341602 | US6572787 | WO2005042934 | - KASPAR, J.; FORNASIERO, P.; HICKEY, N., "Automotive catalytic converters: current status and some perspectives", CATALYSIS TODAY, (2003), vol. 77, pages 419 - 449 |