EP2089467 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING NANOSCALE METAL OXIDE-FILLED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARPOV, Andrey Am Brunnengarten 13 68169 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
HIBST, Hartmut Branichstr. 23 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 03 /
METTLACH, Claudia Lange Roetterstr. 47 68167 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
GEHRINGER, Lionel Rue de la Lauter 3a 67630 Scheibenhard / FR | 05 /
YAMAMOTO, Motonori Tannhäuserring 83-85 68199 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
ELING, Berend Vandsburger Weg 45 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 07 /
GOERTZ, Hans-Helmut Am Wurmberg 11 67251 Freinsheim / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/49] | Ellwanger, Arndt, et al Ellwanger & Baier Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Kern, Hedwig, et al Ellwanger & Kern Patentanwälte Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Ellwanger, Arndt, et al Ellwanger & Kern Patentanwälte Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07822205.6 | 05.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007EP61876 | Priority number, date | EP20060123559 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06123559 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008055869 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2089467 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y30/00, C08F2/44, C08J5/00, C08K9/08 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08F2/44 (EP,US);
C08J5/005 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | C08K9/04, C08L67/02, C08K3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT NANOSKALIGEN METALLOXIDEN GEFÜLLTEN POLYMEREN | [2009/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING NANOSCALE METAL OXIDE-FILLED POLYMERS | [2009/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES POLYMÈRES REMPLIS D'OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES NANOMÉTRIQUES | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0236945 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DX] 1-23 * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 9; examples 1-(6),2 *; | [X]US6774204 (PUTZIG DONALD EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-23* the whole document *; | [DX]WO2005075548 (TIGERWERK LACK UND FARBENFABRI [AT], et al) [DX] 1-23 * pages 2,4,9; example 1 * |