EP2082094 - A PROCESS FOR REDUCING SCALING IN THE PULP AND PAPER INDUSTRY AND USE OF CARBON DIOXIDE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2019/02] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEINO, Hannu Ågatan 18 17262 Sundbyberg / SE | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/31] | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07822609.9 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007EP62362 | Priority number, date | FI20060005727 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: FI 20065727 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059006 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082094 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082094 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2082094 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/00, D21H21/02, C02F5/08, D21H17/65 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
D21H21/02 (EP);
C02F5/083 (EP);
D21C9/008 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP);
C02F2103/28 (EP);
C02F2301/046 (EP);
D21H17/65 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER KALKSTEINBILDUNG IN DER ZELLSTOFF- UND PAPIERINDUSTRIE UND VERWENDUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFDIOXID DAFÜR | [2009/31] | English: | A PROCESS FOR REDUCING SCALING IN THE PULP AND PAPER INDUSTRY AND USE OF CARBON DIOXIDE THEREFOR | [2009/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉDUIRE L'INCRUSTATION DANS L'INDUSTRIE DE LA PÂTE A PAPIER ET DU PAPIER ET UTILISATION DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE POUR CELUI-CI | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Messer Group GmbH Messer-Platz 1 65812 Bad Soden / DE Opponent's representative Münzel, Joachim R. Messer Group GmbH Messer-Platz 1 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [2016/34] | 30.08.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.04.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.11.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2007 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | IE | 15.11.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.11.2007 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0451434 (DENAC NV [BE]) [A] 1,1,1 * claim 1 * * claim 1 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]JPH0892888 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD) [AD] 1,1,1; | [XD]EP0981665 (AGA AB [SE], et al) [XD] 1-23,1-23,1-23 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0010] * | Opposition | EP0981665 | EP0954512 | WO02097189 | EP0281273 | - P. M. TEMKAR et al., "Calcium Carbonate Scale Dissolution in Water Stabilized by Carbon Dioxide Treatment", USA CERL TECHNICAL REPORT N-90/ 01, (19900100), XP055298296 | - R. J. SCHOLZE et al., "Application of Carbon Dioxide Treatment To Manage Scale in Building Potable Water Systems", FEAP-Technical Report -N-92/04T, (19920300), XP055298300 | - A. W. RUDIE et al., "Mineral Scale Management - Part II. Fundamental Chemistry", TAPPI Journal, (20060700), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 17 - 23, XP055298310 | - Air Liquide Deutschland, "Kohlendioxid optimiert alle Stufen der Papierherstellung", PRESS RELEASE, (20050628), pages 1 - 2, XP055298626 | - R. RAUCH et al., "Optimized Deaeration leads to substantial process and quality im-provements in paper manufacturing", African Pulp and Paper Week, (20021008), URL: http://tappsa.co.za/archive/APPW2002/Title/Optimized_deaeration/optimized_deaeration.html, XP055298627 | - PRAKASH M. TEMKAR ET AL, "CALCIUM CARBONATE SCALE DISSOLUTION IN WATER STABILIZED BY CARBON DIOXIDE TREATMENT", USACERL TECHNICAL REPORT N-90/ 01, (19900101), XP055298296 | - RUDIE A.W. ET AL, "MINERAL SCALE MANAGEMENT - PART II. FUNDAMENTAL CHEMISTRY", TAPPI JOURNAL, (200607), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 17 - 23 | - "KOHLENDIOXID OPTIMIERT ALLE STUFEN DER PAPIERHERSTELLUNG", PRESS RELEASE OF AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH OF JUNE 28TH, 2005 | - RAUCH R. ET AL, "OPTIMIZED DEAERATION LEADS TO SUBSTANTIAL PROCESS AND QUALITY IM-PROVEMENTS IN PAPER MANUFACTURING", AFRICAN PULP AND PAPER WEEK, (20021008), URL: HTTP://TAPPSA.CO.ZA/ARCHIVE/APPW2002/TITLE/OPTIMIZED_DEAERATION/OPTIMIZED_DEAERATION.HTML , RETRIEVED ON 05.07.2016, XP055298627 |