EP2102575 - HEAT EXCHANGER INCLUDING AT LEAST THREE HEAT EXCHANGE PORTIONS AND THERMAL ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM INCLUDING SUCH EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques Branche Thermique Moteur Propriété Industrielle 78321 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUANNY, Philippe 47, rue Molière 78280 Guyancourt / FR | 02 /
AP, Ngy Sru 30, avenue des Buissons 78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuse / FR | 03 /
BERNARD, Jean-Sylvain 68, avenue Habert de Montfort 78320 Le Mesnil-saint-denis / FR | 04 /
DA SILVA, Carlos 12, allée Le Clos Pasquier 78124 Mareil Sur Mauldre / FR | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Metz, Gaëlle, et al Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Metz, Gaëlle, et al Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Branche Thermique Moteur 8, rue Louis Lormand B.P. 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07822622.2 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP62380 | Priority number, date | FR20060010954 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0610954 | [2009/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071511 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102575 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04, F28F27/02 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
F28D1/0443 (EP,US);
F01P7/165 (EP,US);
F28F27/02 (EP,US);
F01P2005/105 (EP,US);
F01P2007/168 (EP,US);
F01P2060/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT MINDESTENS DREI WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHTEILEN UND WÄRMEENERGIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT SOLCH EINEM TAUSCHER | [2009/39] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER INCLUDING AT LEAST THREE HEAT EXCHANGE PORTIONS AND THERMAL ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM INCLUDING SUCH EXCHANGER | [2009/39] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR COMPRENANT AU MOINS TROIS PARTIES D'ECHANGES DE CHALEUR ET SYSTEME DE GESTION DE L'ENERGIE THERMIQUE COMPORTANT UN TEL ECHANGEUR | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3481152 (SEELEY WILLIAM M) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]US5101640 (FUKUSHIMA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 16, paragraphs 1-60; figures 19-21 *; | [A]FR2682160 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US5353757 (SUSA SUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-12,14,15 * column 1, lines 1-12 * * column 12, line 16 - column 13, line 7; figures 1,17 * [Y] 4-7; | [A]US5526873 (MARSAIS CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]DE10328458 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1531309 (CALSONIC KANSEI UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 4-7 * column 2, lines 3-9 * * column 3, lines 19-37; figures 1-3 * |