EP2063049 - UNDERGROUND DWELLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biovivienda, S.l. Polígono Industrial Alberique C/Labradores Parc. 106 46260 Alberic / ES | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ NAVARRETE, Antonio Polígono Industrial Alberique Labradores. Parcela 106 46260 Alberic (Valencia) / ES | 02 /
MARTINEZ NAVARRETE, Rafael Polígono Industrial Alberique Labradores. Parcela 106 46260 Alberic (Valencia) / ES | 03 /
MARTINEZ NAVARRETE, Maximino Polígono Industrial Alberique Labradores. Parcela 106 46260 Alberic (Valencia) / ES | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A. Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07822922.6 | 13.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007ES00515 | Priority number, date | ES20060002324 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: ES 200602324 | ES20070000772 | 23.03.2007 Original published format: ES 200700772 | [2009/22] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008031907 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063049 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04H9/12 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
E04H9/12 (EP,ES,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | UNTERIRDISCHE BOHRUNG | [2009/22] | English: | UNDERGROUND DWELLING | [2009/22] | French: | HABITATION SOUTERRAINE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2009 | Translation filed | 12.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3228161 (MCCOWN FRED M); | [A]US3996714 (HAZELETT JR EARL T); | [Y]US4297817 (BULLOCK RALPH, et al); | [A]US4336674 (WEBER RAYMOND C); | [A]DE3403005 (ZIPSER RUDOLF DIPL-ING); | [A]US5317848 (ABBEY JAY E [US]); | [A]WO9505513 (BLAZLEY DESIGNS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [Y]ES1030615U (GARCIA GONZALEZ ANDRES [ES]) |