|
04.01.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
17.11.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
26.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
8 |