EP2074237 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING HOT-FORGED PARTS MADE OF A MAGNESIUM ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Transmission Systems 18 Boulevard Louis Seguin 92700 Colombes / FR | For all designated states Manoir Aerospace 46/52 quai de la Râpée 75012 Paris / FR | [2017/31] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Safran Transmission Systems 18 Boulevard Louis Seguin 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
For all designated states Manoir Industries 37 Rue de Liège 75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states HISPANO-SUIZA 18, Boulevard Louis Seguin 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
For all designated states Manoir Industries 37 Rue de Liège 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTREL, Pascal 20 Avenue du Général Leclerc 10200 Bar sur Aube / FR | 02 /
LUBIN, Sophie 58 Avenue du Général Leclerc 95220 Herblay / FR | 03 /
MAUHE, Christian, Henri, Paul 13 rue des Morillons 78500 SARTROUVILLE / FR | 04 /
ROBERT, Isabelle 114 Avenue Carnot 78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR | 05 /
STRACCHI, Jean 12 rue Croisette 10200 Bar sur Aube / FR | [2009/28] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
CANTREL, Pascal 20 Avenue du Général Leclerc 10200 Bar sur Aube / FR | ||
02 /
LUBIN, Sophie 58 Avenue du Général Leclerc 95220 Herblay / FR | |||
03 /
MAUHE, Christian, Henri, Paul Résidence les Fossettes 29 rue Desaix 78800 Houilles / FR | |||
04 /
ROBERT, Isabelle 114 Avenue Carnot 78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR | |||
05 /
STRACCHI, Jean 12 rue Croisette 10200 Bar sur Aube / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/27] | Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823307.9 | 19.07.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007FR01245 | Priority number, date | FR20060053053 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0653053 | [2009/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008009825 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2074237 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2074237 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/06, C22C23/06 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
C22C23/06 (EP,US);
C22F1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/08] |
Former [2010/06] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HEISS GESCHMIEDETEN TEILEN AUS EINER MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNG | [2009/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING HOT-FORGED PARTS MADE OF A MAGNESIUM ALLOY | [2009/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PIECES FORGEES A CHAUD EN ALLIAGE DE MAGNESIUM | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 27.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005035811 (MAGNESIUM ELEKTRON LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 1-24 * * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * example 7 *; | [XA]EP1329530 (DEAD SEA MAGNESIUM LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-28 * * column 3, paragraph 7 - paragraph 12 * * column 4, paragraph 18 - column 7, paragraph 34 * * column 9, paragraph 41 * * figures 3-7 * [A] 3-13; | [XA]WO2005052204 (KAWAMURA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0123] * [A] ; | [PX]EP1690954 (KAWAMURA YOSHIHITO [JP]) [PX] 1,2; | [A]EP1640466 (UNIV KUMAMOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]GB1023128 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US3157496 (FOERSTER GEORGE S) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US3092492 (FOERSTER GEORGE S) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004001087 (CAST CENTRE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US4116731 (TIKHOVA NINA MIKHAILOVNA, et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-4 * * examples 1-3 *; | [A]WO9624701 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-19 *; | [A]US2003000608 (HORIE TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-20 * |