EP2047676 - REMOVABLE SECURE PORTABLE ELECTRONIC ENTITY COMPRISING MEANS FOR AUTHORIZING DELAYED RETRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 50 quai Michelet 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | [2011/31] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 102, boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTIN, Marc 33, rue du Moulin de Bechereau 78720 La Celle les Bordes / FR | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823317.8 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007FR01256 | Priority number, date | FR20060053212 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0653212 | [2009/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008015326 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047676 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047676 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/765 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N21/4184 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4408 (EP,US);
H04N21/4516 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE, ABNEHMBARE UND SICHERE ELEKTRONISCHE EINHEIT MIT FUNKTION ZUR AUTORISIERUNG VERZÖGERTER NEUÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2009/16] | English: | REMOVABLE SECURE PORTABLE ELECTRONIC ENTITY COMPRISING MEANS FOR AUTHORIZING DELAYED RETRANSMISSION | [2009/16] | French: | ENTITE ELECTRONIQUE PORTABLE SECURISEE AMOVIBLE COMPORTANT DES MOYENS POUR AUTORISER UNE RETRANSMISSION DIFFEREE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 10.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | HU | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | LU | 20.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
LU | 20.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
LU | 20.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | MT | 06.07.2011 | |
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JP2004193944 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]EP1633133 (TREK 2000 INT LTD [SG]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202006001690U (TERRATEC ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |