EP2047174 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE COMPRISING A VAT FOR BOILING WATER AND SCALE REMOVING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M, Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELUS, Dominique Résidence Tournesols F-38200 Serpaize / FR | 02 /
METAY, Cédric Serve et Grand Champ F-38270 Primarette / FR | 03 /
GIOVALLE, Christian Lieu dit "Les Granges" F-38440 Moidieu Detourbe / FR | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
GELUS, Dominique Résidence Tournesols F-38200 Serpaize / FR | ||
02 /
METAY, Cédric 26, rue Gilbert Ollier Résidence le Dauphiné F-38780 Pont Evêque / FR | |||
03 /
GIOVALLE, Christian Lieu dit "Les Granges" F-38440 Moidieu Detourbe / FR | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69132 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69132 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/16] | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172 69132 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823384.8 | 01.08.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007FR01331 | Priority number, date | FR20060007124 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0607124 | [2009/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008017758 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047174 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047174 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/28, F22B37/54, D06F75/12, F22B37/48 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
F22B37/54 (EP);
F22B1/28 (EP);
F22B37/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSANWENDUNG MIT EINEM KESSEL ZUM KOCHEN VON WASSER UND EINEM MITTEL GEGEN KESSELSTEIN | [2009/16] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE COMPRISING A VAT FOR BOILING WATER AND SCALE REMOVING MEANS | [2009/16] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTROMENAGER COMPORTANT UNE CUVE DANS LAQUELLE DE L'EAU EST PORTEE A EBULLITION ET DES MOYENS POUR EVACUER LE TARTRE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2007 | CY | 14.03.2012 | CZ | 14.03.2012 | DK | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | LT | 14.03.2012 | LV | 14.03.2012 | MT | 14.03.2012 | PL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SE | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | IS | 14.07.2012 | IE | 01.08.2012 | LU | 01.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LU | 01.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 14.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2560729 (SAMYN EDOUARD [BE]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 32; figure -; claim - ** abstract *; | [A]GB2268795 (TROUVAY & CAUVIN ETS [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5337703 (SCHLESCH RONALD D [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 26; figure -; claim - * * abstract *; | [A]WO0017575 (AXAIR AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6427637 (INEICHEN KURT [CH]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 9; figure -; claim - * * abstract * |