EP2066191 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A MAGNETIC CLOSURE SYSTEM AND RELATED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSTEMMAG, société par actions simplifiée 9, rue du Croissant 75002 Paris / FR | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SITBON, Eric 9, rue du Croissant 75002 Paris / FR | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/02] |
Former [2009/24] | Benech, Frédéric 146-150, Avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823471.3 | 03.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007FR01430 | Priority number, date | FR20060007678 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0607678 | [2009/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008025905 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066191 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066191 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A41F1/00, A43C11/00, A43B1/00, A45C13/10, H01F7/02 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
A41F1/002 (EP);
A43B1/0054 (EP);
A43C11/00 (EP);
A45C13/1069 (EP);
A44D2203/00 (EP);
H01F7/0263 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | A41F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MAGNETISCHEN VERSCHLUSSSYSTEMS UND VERWANDTES SYSTEM | [2009/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A MAGNETIC CLOSURE SYSTEM AND RELATED SYSTEM | [2009/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET DIPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN SYSTEME DE FERMETURE MAGNETIQUE, ET SYSTEME CORRESPONDANT | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 01.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2007 | AT | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MT | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | GB | 03.09.2016 | IE | 03.09.2016 | LU | 03.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | FR | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.09.2007 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
GB | 03.09.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.09.2007 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
GB | 03.09.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
GB | 03.09.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2880520 (FASTMAG SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPLI [FR]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, lines 16-22 * * page 2, lines 16-32 * * page 3, line 28 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, lines 1-3 * * page 7, lines 1-3 * [Y] 12-25; | [Y]WO03056956 (SITBON ERIC [FR]; SITBON AGNES [FR]) [Y] 12-25 * abstract * * pages 6,8,9,14 * * pages 15,19,20 * * pages 23,26,28 * * pages 40-43,46 * * pages 59,60 * * claims 24,25,32-34 *; | [A]US2006192642 (RUIZ MARC L [US] ET AL) [A] 14 * abstract *; | [A]GB2355281 (CHOWN PETER A C [GB]) [A] 22 * abstract * * page 3, lines 7-23 * * page 5, lines 11-23 *; | [A]WO2005013738 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; MARMAROPOULOS GEORGE [US]; VU GIA) [A] 1,14,22 * abstract * * pages 6,7,8 * |