Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8278807 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2012 | B2 | US2010187999 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007FR51582 | 03.07.2007 | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5108892B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2012 | B2 | JP2010507206 | 04.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007FR51582 | 03.07.2007 | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2080254 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2010 | B1 | EP2080254 | 22.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007FR51582 | 03.07.2007 | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE461544T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007FR51582 | 03.07.2007 | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602007005395D1 | 29.04.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007FR51582 | 03.07.2007 | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008047013 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2342987T | 20.07.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2907269 | 30.01.2009 | B1 | FR2907269 | 18.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0609081 | 17.10.2006 |