EP2080254 - RADIOFREQUENCY PLASMA GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGNERAY, André 5, Bis rue Neuve Saint Germain 92100 Boulogne / FR | 02 /
PARIENTE, Marc 45, rue Duhesme 75018 Paris / FR | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Religieux, Vincent Renault s.a.s. TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf F-78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Religieux, Vincent Renault s.a.s. TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf F-78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823538.9 | 03.07.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007FR51582 | Priority number, date | FR20060009081 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0609081 | [2009/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008047013 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080254 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080254 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/44, H01T13/50 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H01T13/44 (EP,US);
H01T13/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZ-PLASMAERZEUGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/30] | English: | RADIOFREQUENCY PLASMA GENERATION DEVICE | [2009/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GENERATION DE PLASMA RADIOFREQUENCE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 05.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IE | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | LV | 17.03.2010 | MT | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | LU | 03.07.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IT | 03.07.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IT | 03.07.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2859830 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2878658 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) |