EP2066832 - IMPROVED CUTTING WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCV Intellectual Capital, LLC One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, OH 43659 / US | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONT, Dominique 165 Route de la Porrettaz 73190 Saint-Baldoph / FR | 02 /
OUDART, Michel 74 Rue de la Belle Etoile Les Hauts de Chamoux 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
FONT, Dominique 165 Route de la Porrettaz 73190 Saint-Baldoph / FR | ||
02 /
OUDART, Michel 74 Rue de la Belle Etoile Les Hauts de Chamoux 73000 Chambéry / FR | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823626.2 | 23.07.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007FR51708 | Priority number, date | FR20060053122 | 26.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0653122 | [2009/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008012466 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066832 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066832 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D01G1/04 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
D01G1/04 (EP,KR,US);
D01G1/00 (KR);
Y10T83/2109 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4838 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES SCHNEIDRAD | [2009/24] | English: | IMPROVED CUTTING WHEEL | [2009/24] | French: | ROUE DE COUPE PERFECTIONNEE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2007 | AT | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | IE | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4063479 (RONCATO GIORDANO) [A] 1,13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0040145 (SAINT GOBAIN VETROTEX [FR]) [X] 1,3-13 * figures 1b,3,4a,4b; claims 1,2 *; | [A]JPH0734331 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1144738 (VAN DER MAST WILLEM FRANS [NL]) [A] 1,13* figures 3,6; claim 19 * | by applicant | EP0040145 |