EP2069048 - METHOD OF FORMING AN AGENT AND ITS USE IN DESULPHURISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-I Drilling Fluids UK Limited Holburn House 475-485 Union Street Aberdeen AB11 6DB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states M-I Drilling Fluids UK Limited Holborn House 475-485 Union Street Aberdeen AB11 6DB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMBROOK, Rodney, Martin 15 Pine View Ashgate Chesterfield S40 4DN / GB | [2014/23] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
SAMBROOK, Rodney, Martin 15 Pine View Ashgate Chesterfield S40 4DN / GB | Representative(s) | Moffat, John Andrew, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Moffat, John Andrew, et al avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/21] | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/52] | Roberts, Scott Anthony, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw Limited 1 Hagley Road 10th Floor Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07824001.7 | 02.10.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007GB03744 | Priority number, date | GB20060019396 | 02.10.2006 Original published format: GB 0619396 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008040966 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2069048 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069048 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/02, B01J20/06, B01J20/28, B01J20/30, B01D53/48, B01D53/52, C10G25/00 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
B01D53/52 (EP,NO,US);
B01D53/48 (NO);
B01D53/8603 (GB);
B01J31/32 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/485 (EP,US);
B01J20/02 (NO,US);
B01J20/0222 (EP,US);
B01J20/0229 (EP,US);
B01J20/0237 (EP,US);
B01J20/0244 (EP,US);
B01J20/0277 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/28026 (EP,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,US);
B01J20/28054 (EP,US);
B01J20/28085 (EP,US);
B01J20/285 (GB);
B01J20/30 (EP,US);
B01J20/3007 (EP,US);
B01J20/3028 (EP,US);
B01J20/3042 (EP,US);
B01J20/305 (EP,US);
B01J20/3064 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
B01J23/06 (GB);
B01J23/34 (GB);
B01J23/72 (GB);
B01J23/745 (GB);
C10G25/00 (NO);
C10G25/003 (EP,US);
B01D2253/112 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1124 (EP,US);
B01D2256/24 (EP,US);
B01D2257/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | B01D53/48, B01D53/52, B01J20/02, C10G25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINES MITTELS UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG BEI DER ENTSCHWEFELUNG | [2009/25] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING AN AGENT AND ITS USE IN DESULPHURISATION | [2009/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN AGENT ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA DÉSULFURATION | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11183621.9 / EP2402069 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IE | 02.10.2014 | LU | 02.10.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9817374 (DYTECH CORP LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO0170907 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US], et al); | [Y]WO0179139 (DYTECH CORP LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2004108273 (ZEOCHEM AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2006027593 (DYTECH CORP LTD [GB], et al); | [PX]WO2007033083 (ABELA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9817374 | WO2006027593 | WO2007033083 |